Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Kreidler

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

Titular Bishop of Edistiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1946 Born
18 Mar 197225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
6 Jun 199145.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
6 Jun 199145.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Edistiana
31 Aug 199145.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Edistiana
2 Mar 201770.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Kreidler (VIAF: 121055848)
Bishop Johannes Kreidler (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorb-Grünmettstetten

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rottenburg-Stuttgart.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,607
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017