Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Rieger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

Titular Bishop of Tigava

Titular See: (Padri di Schonstatt)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1922BornWi▀goldingen
29 Jul 195128.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
20 Dec 198462.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
20 Dec 198462.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigava
2 Feb 198562.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigava
31 Jul 199673.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
10 Apr 201390.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Rieger:
Bishop Bernhard Rieger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013