Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miłosław-Jan Kołodziejczyk


Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

Titular Bishop of Avissa


23 Jun 1928Born
29 Jun 195224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Częstochowa, Poland
5 Dec 197850.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
5 Dec 197850.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Avissa
31 Dec 197850.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avissa
3 Mar 199465.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Miłosław-Jan Kołodziejczyk (VIAF: 311342344)
Bishop Miłosław-Jan Kołodziejczyk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa

Birth PlaceSułoszowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Ordained PriestHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Death PlaceCzęstochowa, Archdiocese of Częstochowa
Buried Place (Original)Bishop's Crypt, Mystery of the Resurrection in Emmaus, Church, Częstochowa, Archdiocese of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)


Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches


About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018