Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flávio Giovenale, S.D.B.

Bishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1954 Born
8 Sep 197117.2ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 Dec 198127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Oct 199743.3AppointedBishop of Abaetetuba, Para, Brazil
8 Dec 199743.5Ordained BishopBishop of Abaetetuba, Para, Brazil
19 Sep 201258.2AppointedBishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
19 Sep 201864.2AppointedBishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Flávio Giovenale
Bishop Flávio Giovenale S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Cruzeiro do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurello, Italy
Ordained BishopSão José Operário, Church, Manaus, Archdiocese of Manaus, Amazonas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cruzeiro do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,175
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 19 Sep 2018

Quantcast