Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria Chaves dos Reis

Bishop of Abaetetuba, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1962 BornOeiras do Pará
21 Nov 199634.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cametá, Para, Brazil
3 Jul 201350.6AppointedBishop of Abaetetuba, Para, Brazil
5 Oct 201350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Abaetetuba, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Maria Chaves dos Reis:
Bishop José Maria Chaves dos Reis (born ) Bishop of Abaetetuba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Abaetetuba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 3 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013