Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Gelat

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Titular Bishop of Menois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1885BornJaffa
21 Jun 190822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
30 Apr 194862.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
30 Apr 194862.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Menois
27 Jun 194862.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Menois
19 Jan 196882.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Vincent Gelat:
Bishop Vincent Gelat (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013