Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusebio L. Elizondo Almaguer, M.Sp.S.

Auxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

Titular Bishop of Acholla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1954 Born
197419.3ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Holy Spirit
18 Aug 198430.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Holy Spirit
12 May 200550.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
12 May 200550.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Acholla
6 Jun 200550.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acholla

MicroData Summary for Eusebio L. Elizondo Almaguer
Bishop Eusebio L. Elizondo Almaguer M.Sp.S. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Seattle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVictoria Tamaulipas, México

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Seattle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 May 2017