Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Luís da Veiga Cabral e Câmara

Deceased

Bishop of Bragança e Miranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1758BornVianna
Sep 1786³27.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 178628.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 179233.9SelectedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
17 Jun 179334.6ConfirmedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
3 Nov 179334.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
13 Jun 181960.5DiedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Luís da Veiga Cabral e Câmara
Bishop António Luís da Veiga Cabral e Câmara (born , died ) Bishop of Bragança e Miranda

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016