Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bulus Dauwa Yohanna

Vicar Apostolic of Kontagora, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Scebatiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1970 Born
10 Jan 199827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ilorin, Nigeria
21 May 200231.4IncardinatedPriest of Kontagora, Nigeria
2 Feb 201241.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kontagora, Nigeria
2 Feb 201241.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
3 May 201241.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scebatiana

MicroData Summary for Bulus Dauwa Yohanna
Bishop Bulus Dauwa Yohanna (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Kontagora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVuroro
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Saint Michael, Cathedral, Kontagora, Vicariate Apostolic of Kontagora

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Kontagora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 2 Mar 2012
  • c2+: CB, 16 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast