Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ayo-Maria Atoyebi, O.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Ilorin, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1944 Born
17 Dec 197834.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Mar 199247.2AppointedBishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
17 May 199247.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
11 Jun 201974.5ResignedBishop of Ilorin, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Ayo-Maria Atoyebi
Bishop Ayo-Maria Atoyebi O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ilorin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOkerimi-Oro
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Ilorin, Diocese of Ilorin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ilorin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,774
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast