Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlos Cardinal da Cunha e Menezes

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1759BornLisboa
4 Jun 178425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
9 Nov 181859.5SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
23 Aug 181960.3ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
27 Sep 181960.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 181960.6Ordained BishopPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Dec 182566.6DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Carlos da Cunha e Menezes
Carlos Cardinal da Cunha e Menezes (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 77
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1819

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016