Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Chacim (Chachim), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Macau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1767BornTorres Novas, Portugal
26 Sep 179023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Aug 180436.9AppointedBishop of Macau, China
Dec 1804³37.2Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
31 Jan 182860.4DiedBishop of Macau, China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Chacim (Chachim):
Bishop Francisco Chacim (Chachim) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Macau

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013