Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristoforo Domenico Carullo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1889BornStefanaconi
26 Jul 191424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 194050.4AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
28 Apr 194050.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
15 Sep 194657.1AppointedArchbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy
31 Jan 196878.4DiedArchbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Domenico Carullo:
Archbishop Cristoforo Domenico Carullo O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015