Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dante Gustavo Braida Lorenzón

Bishop of La Rioja, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1968 Born
21 Apr 199627.7Ordained PriestPriest of Reconquista, Argentina
11 Apr 201546.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mendoza, Argentina
11 Apr 201546.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
12 Jun 201546.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
11 Dec 201749.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mendoza, Argentina
22 May 201849.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Mendoza, Argentina
13 Dec 201850.4AppointedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
28 Dec 201850.4InstalledBishop of La Rioja, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Dante Gustavo Braida Lorenzón
Bishop Dante Gustavo Braida Lorenzón (born ) Bishop of La Rioja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReconquista, Diocese of Reconquista
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de los Dolores, Church, Mendoza, Archdiocese of Mendoza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Rioja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 15 Apr 2015
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,505
  • ab: CB, 11 Dec 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2018
  • i: CB, 14 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Dec 2018

Quantcast