Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Xenopulos, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1898Born
31 Jul 192627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Feb 194748.4AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
22 Feb 194748.4AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
20 Jul 194748.9Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
195253.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece
27 Jun 197475.8RetiredBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
27 Jun 197475.8RetiredApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece
27 Jun 197475.8RetiredBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
28 Jan 198081.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos), Greece

MicroData Summary for Georges Xenopulos
Bishop Georges Xenopulos S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSyra

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1975
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018