Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcus Sigala

Deceased

Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1882BornSyros
25 May 190724.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 194764.4AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
24 Aug 194764.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
10 Mar 195067.4DiedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Marcus Sigala:
Archbishop Marcus Sigala (born , died ) Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013