Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyakinthos Gad

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Greece (Greek)

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1912BornSyros
1 Dec 193523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Greece (Greek)
17 Feb 195846.0AppointedApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)
17 Feb 195846.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
12 Mar 195846.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
197562.9ResignedApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)
30 Jan 197563.0DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Greece (Greek)

MicroData Summary for Hyakinthos Gad:
Bishop Hyakinthos Gad (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Greece

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013