Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dimitrios Salachas

Apostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1939 BornAthens
9 Feb 196424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Greece (Greek)
23 Apr 200868.9AppointedApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)
23 Apr 200868.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Carcabia
24 May 200869.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carcabia
14 May 201272.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis

MicroData Summary for Dimitrios Salachas:
Bishop Dimitrios Salachas (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Greece

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Greece (Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,749
  • ab: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2012, Number 9
  • ab: CB, 3 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013