Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Hermann Ignaz Ferdinand von Wolf-Metternich zu Gracht

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1665Born
25 Dec 170237.4Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
16 Sep 172055.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
16 Sep 172055.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
16 Feb 172155.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
28 Oct 172257.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Hermann Ignaz Ferdinand von Wolf-Metternich zu Gracht
Bishop Wilhelm Hermann Ignaz Ferdinand von Wolf-Metternich zu Gracht (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCampus Marianus, Abtei, Diocese of Error [munt]

  • a priest for 19.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 6
  • obl: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,051

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Jul 2020

Quantcast