Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pantaleon Bruns, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thyatira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1670Born
169120.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Feb 169827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Jan 172150.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
20 Jan 172150.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
23 Mar 172150.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
15 Dec 172757.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Pantaleon Bruns
Bishop Pantaleon Bruns O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgholz

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 10
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,611
  • b/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast