Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Vasconcellos Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1731BornCastrodairo
28 Sep 175524.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Oct 175524.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 177038.9SelectedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
6 Aug 177039.4ConfirmedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
28 Oct 177039.6Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
18 Nov 177140.6InstalledBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
29 Dec 177241.8SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
8 Mar 177341.9ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
29 Sep 177342.5InstalledBishop of Lamego, Portugal
29 Jan 178654.8DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Vasconcellos Pereira:
Bishop Manuel de Vasconcellos Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1776
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 250, and Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015