Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Tourinho Neto

Bishop of Cruz das Almas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1964 Born
20 Jan 199026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Jequié, Bahia, Brazil
12 Nov 201450.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
12 Nov 201450.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafi
17 Jan 201551.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satafi
22 Nov 201753.8AppointedBishop of Cruz das Almas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Tourinho Neto
Bishop Antônio Tourinho Neto (born ) Bishop of Cruz das Almas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJequié, Diocese of Jequié, Bahia
Ordained BishopIn Front of, Santo Antônio de Pádua, Cathedral, Jequié, Diocese of Jequié, Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cruz das Almas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,352
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 22 Nov 2017