Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maria José a Santo Tomas, O.P. †

Deceased

Prelate of Mozambico

Titular Bishop of Pentacomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1747BornPonte da Barca, Portugal
18 Jul 178336.5AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
18 Jul 178336.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
28 Oct 178538.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
18 Jul 180154.5DiedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Maria José a Santo Tomas:
Bishop Maria José a Santo Tomas O.P. (born , died ) Prelate of Mozambico

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 39
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 332, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016