Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter David Gregory Smith

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1943Born
15 Jul 197228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
21 Mar 199551.4AppointedBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain
27 May 199551.5Ordained BishopBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain
26 Oct 200158.0AppointedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
30 Apr 201066.5AppointedArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
10 Jun 201066.6InstalledArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
4 Oct 201470.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
28 May 201571.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
10 Jun 201975.6RetiredArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
6 Mar 202076.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Peter David Gregory Smith (VIAF: 1395147)
Archbishop Peter David Gregory Smith (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBattersea, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. John, College, Wonersh, Guildford, Surrey, Diocese of Arundel and Brighton, England
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Norwich, Norfolk, Diocese of East Anglia, England
Death PlaceRoyal Marsden, Hospital, Chelsea, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,555
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: CB, 6 Oct 2014
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 5 Apr 2018
  • c1: CL, 20 Apr 2018
  • bd: CL, 3 Nov 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2019
  • d: CL, 7 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast