Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Schäffler

Bishop Emeritus of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1941 Born
16 Jun 196827.4Ordained PriestPriest of Picos, Piaui, Brazil
15 Mar 200059.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
3 Jun 200059.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
21 Feb 200160.0SucceededBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
24 Aug 201675.5RetiredBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Schäffler
Bishop Alfredo Schäffler (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Parnaíba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaidhofen/Ybbs, Austria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Parnaíba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,778
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 1 Oct 2018

Quantcast