Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Rufino do Rêgo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1926Born
5 Oct 195226.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 197145.2AppointedBishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil
4 Jul 197145.4Ordained BishopBishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil
25 Mar 198660.1AppointedBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
21 Feb 200175.1RetiredBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
10 Aug 201387.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Rufino do Rêgo
Bishop Joaquim Rufino do Rêgo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parnaíba

EventPlace
Birth PlacePicos

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 10 Aug 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018