Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sevastianos Rossolatos

Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

Apostolic Administrator of Rhodos {Rhodes}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1944 Born
21 Jul 196824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Syros (e Milos), Greece
12 Aug 201470.1AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
12 Aug 201470.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece
25 Oct 201470.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Sevastianos Rossolatos
Archbishop Sevastianos Rossolatos (born ) Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErmoupolis

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast