Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Theodoros Kontidis, S.J.

Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

Apostolic Administrator of Rhodos {Rhodes}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1956 Born
1983²26.8EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
9 Oct 198832.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1995²38.8Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Jul 202165.3AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
14 Jul 202165.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece
18 Sep 202165.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Theodoros Kontidis
Archbishop Theodoros Kontidis S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThessaloniki, Vicariate Apostolic of Thessaloniki
Ordained BishopSaint Dionysios, Cathedral, Athēnai, Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 14 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast