Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tarcisio Pillolla

Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1930 BornPimentel
4 Jul 195424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
3 May 198655.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cagliari, Italy
3 May 198655.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cartennae
8 Jun 198655.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cartennae
3 Jul 199969.0AppointedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
8 Mar 200776.7RetiredBishop of Iglesias, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tarcisio Pillolla:
Bishop Tarcisio Pillolla (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iglesias.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013