Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Zedda

Bishop of Iglesias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1947 BornIngurtosu
28 Aug 197124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ales e Terralba, Italy
8 Mar 200759.5AppointedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
13 May 200759.7Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
17 Jun 200759.8InstalledBishop of Iglesias, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Zedda:
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Zedda (born ) Bishop of Iglesias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iglesias.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,420

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013