Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Dettori

Bishop of Ales-Terralba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1940 BornNule
1 Jul 196525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ozieri, Italy
5 Feb 200464.0AppointedBishop of Ales-Terralba, Italy
18 Apr 200464.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ales-Terralba, Italy
2 May 200464.3InstalledBishop of Ales-Terralba, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Dettori:
Bishop Giovanni Dettori (born ) Bishop of Ales-Terralba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ales-Terralba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,577
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013