Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Francesco Cardinal Pompedda

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Deacon of Annunciazione della Beata Vergine Maria a Via Ardeatina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1929BornOzieri, Italy
23 Dec 195122.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 199364.3AppointedDean of the Roman Rota
29 Nov 199768.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bisarcio
6 Jan 199868.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Bisarcio
16 Nov 199970.5AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
21 Feb 200171.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Annunciazione della Beata Vergine Maria a Via Ardeatina
21 Feb 200171.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 200475.1RetiredPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
18 Oct 200677.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Mario Francesco Pompedda
Mario Francesco Cardinal Pompedda (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Apostolic Signatura

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
  • a cardinal for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,181
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 10 Feb 2016