Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal de Magistris

Deceased

Pro-Major Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Ges¨ e Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1926Born
12 Apr 195226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
11 Apr 197953.1AppointedRegent of the Apostolic Penitentiary
6 Mar 199670.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova
28 Apr 199670.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova
22 Nov 200175.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nova
22 Nov 200175.7AppointedPro-Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
4 Oct 200377.6RetiredPro-Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
14 Feb 201588.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Ges¨ e Maria in Via Lata
14 Feb 201588.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Feb 201588.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Ges¨ e Maria in Via Lata
16 Feb 202295.9DiedPro-Major Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for Luigi de Magistris
(VIAF: 233084739; WikiData: Q785103)
Luigi Cardinal de Magistris (born , died ) Pro-Major Penitentiary Emeritus of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari, Italy
Ordained BishopSant'Anna, Church, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari, Italy
Death PlacePoliclinico Universitario Monserrato Duilio Casula, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Michele, Cemetery, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari, Italy

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,716
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab/i: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 16 Feb 2022
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 251, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 10 Sep 2023