Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Pierozan

Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Arena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1964 Born
23 Sep 199632.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of São Paulo, Brazil
24 May 199732.7Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
24 Jul 201954.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
24 Jul 201954.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arena
28 Sep 201955.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arena

MicroData Summary for Jorge Pierozan
Bishop Jorge Pierozan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVanini, Diocese of Caxias
Ordained BishopCathedral, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Paulo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2019
  • od/ob/c2: CB, 24 Jul 2019
  • c3+: CB, 27 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 29 Sep 2019

Quantcast