Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zygmunt Józef Pawłowicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gdańsk, Poland

Titular Bishop of Tamallula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1927Born
20 Sep 195224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gdańsk, Poland
10 Aug 198557.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
10 Aug 198557.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamallula
7 Sep 198557.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamallula
24 Jan 200577.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
18 Mar 201082.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gdańsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Zygmunt Józef Pawłowicz
Bishop Zygmunt Józef Pawłowicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gdańsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGdańsk, Diocese of Gdańsk
Ordained BishopGdańsk, Diocese of Gdańsk

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,918

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast