Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Franco de Oliveira

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornCondeixa-a-Nova, Portugal
9 Jun 168745.4AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
5 Oct 168745.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
9 Jan 169250.0AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
18 Apr 170159.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
2 Aug 171573.5DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Franco de Oliveira:
Archbishop João Franco de Oliveira (born 1642, died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169, and Page 270
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 342
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015