Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matias de Figueiredo e Mello

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1653¹Born
12 May 168734.3AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
28 Mar 168835.2Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
18 Jul 169441.5DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matias de Figueiredo e Mello
Bishop Matias de Figueiredo e Mello (born 1653, died ) Bishop of Olinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArganil, Portugal

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 295
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017