Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emmanuel Obbo, A.J.

Archbishop of Tororo

Apostolic Administrator of Soroti

Note/Previous Titular See: (Congregazione degli Apostoli di Gesł)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1952 BornNagoke/Kirewa
8 Dec 197927.2ProfessedMember of Other
13 Dec 198634.2Ordained PriestPriest of Other
27 Jun 200754.7AppointedBishop of Soroti, Uganda
6 Oct 200755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Soroti, Uganda
2 Jan 201461.2AppointedArchbishop of Tororo, Uganda
2 Jan 201461.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Soroti, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Obbo:
Archbishop Emmanuel Obbo A.J. (born ) Archbishop of Tororo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tororo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,548
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Mar 2014