Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Sithunywa Ndlovu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Umzimkulu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1939BornGobamahlambu
4 Jul 197031.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 198647.8AppointedBishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa
25 Apr 198748.1Ordained BishopBishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa
22 Aug 199455.4ResignedBishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa
13 Mar 201374.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Umzimkulu, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Gerard Sithunywa Ndlovu:
Bishop Gerard Sithunywa Ndlovu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Umzimkulu

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013