Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arcangelo Mazzotti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1880Born
17 Jun 190524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Feb 193150.6AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
26 Apr 193150.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
29 Jun 193151.0InstalledArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
29 Jan 196180.5DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arcangelo Mazzotti
Archbishop Arcangelo Mazzotti O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCologne

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018