Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Mayr

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria

Titular Bishop of Agbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1924Born
9 Jul 195025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
12 Mar 197146.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
12 Mar 197146.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Agbia
20 May 197146.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agbia
15 Aug 200177.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
20 Sep 201086.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Jakob Mayr (VIAF: 18030626)
Bishop Jakob Mayr (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKirchbichl

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018