Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul Mary Mathieu

Bishop of Saint-Dié


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1940 BornHadol
11 Apr 196625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Dié, France
14 Dec 200565.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
22 Jan 200665.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul Mary Mathieu:
Bishop Jean-Paul Mary Mathieu (born ) Bishop of Saint-Dié

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Dié.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,044

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013