Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Vuillemin

Auxiliary Bishop of Metz, France

Titular Bishop of Thérouanne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1967 Born
11 Jun 199427.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Dié, France
8 Jan 201951.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France
8 Jan 201951.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thérouanne
3 Feb 201952.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thérouanne

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Vuillemin (VIAF: 220255333)
Bishop Jean-Pierre Vuillemin (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRambervillers, Diocese of Saint-Dié
Ordained BishopSt-Etienne, Cathedral, Metz, Diocese of Metz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Metz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2019
  • ob: CB, 8 Jan 2019
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jan 2019
  • c1: AM, 11 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast