Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armand Henri Paul Maillard

Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1943 Born
28 Jun 197027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Dié, France
2 Aug 199653.1AppointedBishop of Laval, France
5 Oct 199653.2Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
11 Sep 200764.2AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
14 Oct 200764.3InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
25 Jul 201875.1RetiredArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Armand Henri Paul Maillard (VIAF: 69107585)
Archbishop Armand Henri Paul Maillard (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOffroicourt
Ordained BishopLaval, Diocese of Laval

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bourges.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,854
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2018
  • mn: CB, 25 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast