Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Marques da Silva, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cochin, India

Note/Previous Titular See: (Joseph a Solitudine)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1745Born
23 Sep 176924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
9 Apr 178337.6SelectedBishop of Cochin, India
18 Jul 178337.9ConfirmedBishop of Cochin, India
21 Nov 178439.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India

MicroData Summary for José Marques da Silva
Bishop José Marques da Silva O.C.D. (born ) Bishop of Cochin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalreu, Portugal

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017