Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Luis Vasconcellos, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1685Born
3 Dec 170116.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
19 Jan 175064.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
19 Jan 175064.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thermopylae
1751¹65.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thermopylae
6 Mar 175266.9SucceededArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
11 Oct 175469.5DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Luis Vasconcellos
Archbishop João Luis Vasconcellos S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Portugal

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 186, and Page 403
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017