Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente José Colaço Leitão, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cochin, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1704Born
5 Feb 174540.1SelectedBishop of Cochin, India
8 Mar 174540.2ConfirmedBishop of Cochin, India
11 Dec 174641.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
31 Jan 177166.1DiedBishop of Cochin, India

MicroData Summary for Clemente José Colaço Leitão
Bishop Clemente José Colaço Leitão S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Cochin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBom Jardim

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 171
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017