Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Alfons Kusz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gliwice, Poland

Titular Bishop of Tagarbala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1939Born
24 Jun 196222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Opole, Poland
8 Jul 198545.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland
8 Jul 198545.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagarbala
15 Aug 198545.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagarbala
25 Mar 199252.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gliwice, Poland
15 Nov 201475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Gliwice, Poland
15 Mar 202181.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gliwice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Gerard Alfons Kusz
Bishop Gerard Alfons Kusz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gliwice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDziergowice, Diocese of Opole
Ordained PriestOpole, Diocese of Opole
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Opole, Diocese of Opole
Death PlaceGliwice, Diocese of Gliwice
Buried Place (Original)Dziergowice, Diocese of Gliwice

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 8,031
  • d: CB, 15 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast