Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yustinus Harjosusanto, M.S.F.

Archbishop of Samarinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1953 BornMuntilan
6 Jan 198228.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
9 Jan 200248.3AppointedBishop of Tanjung Selor, Indonesia
14 Apr 200248.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tanjung Selor, Indonesia
16 Feb 201561.4AppointedArchbishop of Samarinda, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Yustinus Harjosusanto:
Archbishop Yustinus Harjosusanto M.S.F. (born ) Archbishop of Samarinda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Samarinda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,175
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015