Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulinus Yan Olla, M.S.F.

Bishop of Tanjung Selor, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1963 Born
22 Jul 199128.0Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
28 Aug 199229.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
22 Feb 201854.6AppointedBishop of Tanjung Selor, Indonesia
5 May 201854.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tanjung Selor, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Paulinus Yan Olla (VIAF: 309892365)
Bishop Paulinus Yan Olla M.S.F. (born ) Bishop of Tanjung Selor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeom-Eban, Diocese of Atambua
Ordained BishopLapangan Agatis, Tanjung Selor, Diocese of Tanjung Selor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tanjung Selor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 May 2018

Quantcast